Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-François d’Aviau Du Bois-de-Sanzay

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1736BornSaint-Martin-de-Sanzay
13 Sep 178953.1SelectedArchbishop of Vienne, France
14 Dec 178953.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Vienne, France
3 Jan 179053.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Vienne, France
26 Sep 180165.1ResignedArchbishop of Vienne, France
12 Apr 180265.7SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
2 Jun 180265.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
11 Jul 182689.9DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François d’Aviau Du Bois-de-Sanzay:
Archbishop Charles-François d’Aviau Du Bois-de-Sanzay (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013