Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Danise, M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1818BornNapoli
1839¹20.4ProfessedMember of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
25 Apr 184122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Ministers of the Sick
9 Aug 188365.0AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
15 Aug 188365.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
24 Mar 188465.7AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
8 Jan 189879.5DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Danise:
Bishop Raffaele Danise M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 169, and Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013