Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Dalena

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1804Born
14 Mar 182924.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187167.3AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
27 Dec 187167.4Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
18 Jan 188378.4DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Dalena (VIAF: 88747572)
Bishop Antonio Dalena (born , died ) Bishop of Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlacePutignano, Diocese of Conversano
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017