Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Paul de Cuttoli

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1826Born
20 Dec 185125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ajaccio, France
21 Dec 186943.6SelectedBishop of Ajaccio, France
21 Mar 187043.8ConfirmedBishop of Ajaccio, France
18 Apr 187043.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
18 Dec 187044.6DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Paul de Cuttoli (VIAF: 120172332)
Bishop Pierre-Paul de Cuttoli (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuttoli-Corticchiato
Ordained BishopSt. Louis des Francais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 18.9 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1870, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017