Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Curlo

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹BornAlbenga
27 Aug 161439.6AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
21 Sep 161439.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
13 Nov 161641.8DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Curlo
Bishop Girolamo Curlo (born 1575, died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 363
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 31
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jul 2016