Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Curcio

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1827Born
25 May 185023.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 187447.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
21 Dec 187447.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Alalis
27 Dec 187447.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alalis
11 Feb 187548.1SucceededBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
15 Jul 189871.5DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Curcio
Bishop Antonio Maria Curcio (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePizzo, Diocese of Mileto
Ordained BishopTrinite des Monts, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 83, and Page 426
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017