Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Csáky de Keresztszegh

Deceased

Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1760³BornKluknó, Hungary
14 Sep 178524.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Oct 178524.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 181453.9SelectedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
10 Jul 181554.6ConfirmedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
22 Oct 181554.9Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
1 Oct 183069.8DiedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for László Csáky de Keresztszegh:
Bishop László Csáky de Keresztszegh (born , died ) Bishop of Knin (Tinin)

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015