Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Petrus Codde, C.O. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia (Holland Mission)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1648BornAmsterdam
167223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
7 Oct 168839.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
7 Oct 168839.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
7 May 170253.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
7 May 170253.4ResignedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
18 Dec 171062.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Petrus Codde:
Archbishop Petrus Codde C.O. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Batavia (Holland Mission)

  • a priest for 39.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013