Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Cavaliere

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1822Born
23 Sep 184825.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188360.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
15 Mar 188360.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
18 Mar 188360.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
24 Jun 188360.4SucceededBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
Aug 1899³76.5DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Cavaliere
Bishop Giuseppe Cavaliere (born , died Aug 1899) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLungro
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 229, and Page 534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017