Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arsenio del Campo y Monasterio, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1839Born
1863¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
25 Nov 188747.9AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
15 Apr 188848.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
7 Apr 190363.3ResignedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
2 Dec 191272.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
10 Jul 191777.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arsenio del Campo y Monasterio
Bishop Arsenio del Campo y Monasterio O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Caceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltanás, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Basilica, El Escorial

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 166
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017