Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Cammarata

Deceased

Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1885BornSan Cataldo
24 Sep 191125.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 194661.1AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
4 Dec 194661.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
2 Mar 194761.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
24 Feb 195064.3DiedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Cammarata:
Bishop Luigi Cammarata (born , died ) Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,567
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013