Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Calvo

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1728³Born
4 Mar 177142.6AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
Nov 1771³43.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
22 Dec 177345.4DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Calvo
Bishop Francisco Javier Calvo (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbéjar, Spain

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 89, Number 452
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018