Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Blake

Deceased

Bishop of Dromore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1775Born
22 Jan 183357.5AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
17 Mar 183357.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
27 Feb 186084.6ResignedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
6 Mar 186084.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Dromore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Blake (VIAF: 315632394)
Bishop Michael Blake (born , died ) Bishop of Dromore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 180
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,833, Number 10
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast