Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Giovanni Bertolozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1794Born
23 Aug 181824.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 185055.5AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
21 Apr 185055.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
27 Jan 186772.5DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Giovanni Bertolozzi (VIAF: 88714508)
Bishop Paolo Giovanni Bertolozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,858
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,230
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 319
  • c2: CB, 22 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,730
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,850, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast