Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Berruti

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1840Born
24 Sep 186424.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 189858.2AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
8 Dec 189858.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
8 Apr 192180.6DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Berruti
Bishop Pietro Berruti (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorghetto di Borbera, Diocese of Tortona
Ordained BishopFilles du S. Coeur-via Cavour, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 591
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017