Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Aprile e Benso

Deceased

Bishop of Piazza Armerina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1759BornCaltagirone
18 Sep 178425.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 181858.9SelectedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
2 Oct 181859.2ConfirmedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
17 Jan 181959.5Ordained BishopBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
1836¹76.5DiedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Aprile e Benso:
Bishop Girolamo Aprile e Benso (born ) Bishop of Piazza Armerina

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013