Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Saverio Bassi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1745Born
18 Feb 176924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Dec 179752.8AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
21 Dec 179752.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
1821¹75.8DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Bassi
Archbishop Francesco Saverio Bassi O.S.B. (born , died 1821) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpineto

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 20
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast