Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Augusto de Barros

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1837BornRegoa
27 Mar 188446.7AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
18 May 188446.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
1 Mar 190466.6DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Augusto de Barros:
Bishop Joaquim Augusto de Barros (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013