Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabián Sebastián Arenzana y Magdaleno

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1813Born
Feb 1837³24.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 186552.3SelectedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
25 Sep 186552.6ConfirmedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
7 Jan 186652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
9 Nov 187461.8DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabián Sebastián Arenzana y Magdaleno
Bishop Fabián Sebastián Arenzana y Magdaleno (born , died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalahorra
Ordained BishopS. Genes, Madrid

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 170
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 172, Number 948
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017