Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco de Andreis (Andronico)

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1602BornTrau
19 Dec 162624.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 165351.1AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
30 Nov 165351.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
1666¹63.2DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco de Andreis (Andronico):
Bishop Francesco de Andreis (Andronico) (born ) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 116, Number 709
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015