Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Stanislao Andreotti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Subiaco, Italy

Titular Bishop of Vazari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1924Born
25 Oct 194016.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Sep 194824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Jul 197449.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Subiaco, Italy
25 Mar 197752.6AppointedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy
10 Feb 198257.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazari
21 Mar 198257.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazari
3 Jun 199570.8ResignedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy
16 Oct 200379.2DiedAbbot Emeritus of Subiaco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benito Stanislao Andreotti (VIAF: 55589071)
Bishop Benito Stanislao Andreotti O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Subiaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giorgio Lucano

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jul 2017