Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Ancaiani

Deceased

Archbishop of Spoleto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1773³BornSpoleto
10 May 180127.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 181441.2AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
9 Oct 181441.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
27 Jun 182148.0AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
24 Feb 182753.6DiedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mario Ancaiani:
Archbishop Mario Ancaiani (born , died ) Archbishop of Spoleto

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 189, and Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013