Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Bonanni

Deceased

Bishop of Norcia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1766BornRoma
18 Dec 179024.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 182155.0AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
8 Jul 182155.0Ordained BishopBishop of Norcia, Italy
17 Aug 184882.1DiedBishop of Norcia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Bonanni
Bishop Gaetano Bonanni (born , died ) Bishop of Norcia

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1821, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 May 2016