Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis José María Amigó y Ferrer, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1854Born
29 Mar 187924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Apr 190752.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Solsona, Spain
18 Apr 190752.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
9 Jun 190752.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
18 Jul 191358.7AppointedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
1 Oct 193479.9DiedBishop of Segorbe, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis José María Amigó y Ferrer
Bishop Luis José María Amigó y Ferrer O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMasamagrell

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018