Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Alferio

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1591AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
21 Apr 1591Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
26 Mar 1594DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Alferio
Bishop Ludovico Alferio (died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte Marie du peuple, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 235
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 29, Number 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast