Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Alberti

Deceased

Bishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1809Born
20 Sep 184232.9AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
21 Mar 184333.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
21 Mar 184333.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
16 Apr 184333.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia
30 Oct 185142.0SucceededBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
7 Jan 186252.2AppointedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
18 Mar 188070.4DiedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Alberti (VIAF: 27817780)
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Alberti (born , died ) Bishop of Syros (e Milos)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIzmir

  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 190, and Page 356
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,842
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,843, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast