Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}

Archidioecesis Taeguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 March 1962
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Korea, Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 9,129 (3,526 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.daegu-archdiocese.or.kr/
  • Mailing Address: Diocesan Office, 112 Namsan-ro 4-gil, Jung-gu, Daegu 41969, Korea
  • Telephone: (053)250-3024
  • Fax: 250-3018

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Taiku
8 April 1911ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Corea Vicariate Apostolic of Taiku (erected)
13 April 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Taiku Prefecture Apostolic of Kwoszu (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Zenshu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Taiku
12 July 1950Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Taiku Vicariate Apostolic of Taiku
21 January 1957Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Taiku Vicariate Apostolic of Pusan (erected)
Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}
10 March 1962ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Taiku Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}
29 May 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}
Diocese of Wonju
Diocese of Andong (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Taiku
194930,2436,290,000.5%37378173534ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Taiku
Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}
197077,8913,148,9542.5%98281266187541045ap1971
1980126,5533,443,1733.7%88311191,0638257362ap1981
1990245,0244,142,4895.9%120321521,6129870284ap1991
1999342,2634,397,7917.8%213362491,374115958114ap2000
2000359,9644,439,0038.1%222352571,400110958114ap2001
2001371,5324,467,0578.3%239352741,355134943117ap2002
2002382,3614,474,3498.5%249342831,35195954118ap2003
2003391,6074,470,0618.8%277343111,259114955132ap2004
2004402,9584,466,8109.0%282333151,27998950140ap2005
2006419,2994,466,1669.4%315383531,1871071,035146ap2007
2013471,5714,523,73310.4%382474291,0991081,275159ap2014
2016491,9214,533,39710.9%410394491,0951191,039161ap2017
2019507,8334,503,50411.3%444454891,0381241,024162ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast