Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mackenzie-Fort Smith

Dioecesis Mackenziensis-Arcis Smith



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jon Paul Christian Hansen, C.SS.R., Bishop
  • Denis Croteau, O.M.I., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 13 July 1967
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Grouard-McLennan
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Northwest Territories
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 1,523,400 (588,413 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: McK
  • Official Web Site: https://mfsdiocese.ca/
  • Mailing Address: Évêché, 5117-52nd Street, Yellowknife, NT X1A 1T7, Canada
  • Telephone: (867)920-2129
  • Fax: 873-9021

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Mackenzie
3 July 1901SplitVicariate Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie Vicariate Apostolic of Athabaska
Vicariate Apostolic of Mackenzie
9 March 1908Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Mackenzie Prefecture Apostolic of Yukon-Prince Rupert (erected)
Diocese of Mackenzie-Fort Smith
13 July 1967ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mackenzie Diocese of Mackenzie-Fort Smith (Name Changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese)
12 May 1979Territory LostDiocese of Mackenzie-Fort Smith Diocese of Saint Paul in Alberta (Territory between 55 and 58 degree latitude and 110 and 113 longitude)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Mackenzie
195012,00016,00075.0%6060200107924ap1951
196613,80225,40454.3%545425510211233ap1967
Diocese of Mackenzie-Fort Smith
197017,69634,90850.7%55553218710447ap1971
197624,33755,17844.1%1424356567848ap1977
198018,94839,67547.8%3939485625221ap1981
199019,83435,43956.0%118191,0431263340ap1991
199926,20044,86058.4%2573,742151818ap2000
200025,15041,80060.2%3583,14351440ap2001
200125,40442,15460.3%3583,175151440ap2002
200224,58739,88161.7%3692,731161518ap2003
200321,90037,36058.6%3582,737351446ap2004
200428,54042,04067.9%47112,594381646ap2005
201327,05049,15055.0%4483,3811568ap2014
201636,37550,56871.9%4594,041658ap2017
201927,13354,48749.8%4373,876457ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 30 Jun 2021

Quantcast