Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juozas Žemaitis, M.I.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1926Born
25 Sep 194923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
1989²62.3Perpetual VowsPriest of Congregation of Marian Fathers of the Immaculate Conception of the Most Blessed Virgin Mary
10 Mar 198962.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
10 Mar 198962.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
18 Mar 198962.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
24 Dec 199165.3AppointedBishop of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
5 Jan 200275.3RetiredBishop of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
5 Oct 202195.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juozas Žemaitis
Bishop Juozas Žemaitis M.I.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vilkaviškis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGriškabudis
Ordained BishopSs. Peter and Paul, Kaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas
Death PlaceSt. Mary's Care Home, Marijampole

  • a priest for 72.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,246
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • perp: CB, 14 May 2019
  • d: CB, 5 Oct 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Oct 2021

Quantcast