Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julijonas Steponavičius

Deceased

Archbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1911Born
21 Jun 193624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
22 May 195543.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Panevėžys, Lithuania
22 May 195543.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Antarados
11 Sep 195543.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antarados
8 Dec 195746.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vilnius, Lithuania
10 Mar 198977.3AppointedArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
18 Jun 199179.6DiedArchbishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Julijonas Steponavičius
Archbishop Julijonas Steponavičius (born , died ) Archbishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGerveciai, Archdiocese of Vilnius
Ordained PriestCathedral, Vilnius, Archdiocese of Vilnius
Ordained BishopCathedral, Panevėžys, Diocese of Panevėžys
Death PlaceVilnius, Archdiocese of Vilnius

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 76
  • opd/c1: CB, 6 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Oct 2021

Quantcast