Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josip Antun Ujcić

Deceased

Archbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

Apostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Banat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1880Born
27 Jul 190222.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 193656.7AppointedArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
28 Nov 193656.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Banat, Serbia
7 Mar 193757.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
24 Mar 196484.1DiedArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

MicroData Summary for Josip Antun Ujcić
Archbishop Josip Antun Ujcić (born , died ) Archbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePisinvecchio

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1937, Number 15
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 570, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Apr 2021

Quantcast