Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kvirin Klement (Quirinus Clement) Bonefačić

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

Titular Bishop of Ioannina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1870Born
15 Jul 189424.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 192353.0AppointedBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
2 Sep 192353.2Ordained BishopBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
30 Sep 192353.3InstalledBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
9 May 195483.9RetiredBishop of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia
9 May 195483.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioannina
28 Jan 195786.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Kvirin Klement (Quirinus Clement) Bonefačić (VIAF: 4146030579735861794)
Bishop Kvirin Klement (Quirinus Clement) Bonefačić (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Split-Makarska (Spalato-Macarska)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaška
Ordained PriestArchbishop's Palace, Chapel, Gorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Death PlaceBaška

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1923, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast