Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luis Alfonso Tut Tun

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Titular Bishop of Arba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1978 Born
31 Jul 200628.1Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán, México
21 Jun 202445.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
21 Jun 202445.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Arba
22 Aug 202446.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arba

MicroData Summary for Luis Alfonso Tut Tun
(WikiData: Q126855353)
Father Luis Alfonso Tut Tun (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcanceh, Archdiocese of Yucatán
Ordained BishopAuditorio Guelaguetza, Oaxaca, Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2024
  • ob: CB, 26 Jun 2024
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 8 Jul 2024