Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Sorrentino

Bishop of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy

Archbishop (Personal Title) of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1948 Born
24 Jun 197224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nola, Italy
17 Feb 200152.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
19 Mar 200152.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
7 Apr 200152.8InstalledPrelate of Pompei o Beatissima Vergine Maria del Santissimo Rosario, Italy
2 Aug 200355.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
19 Nov 200557.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy
11 Feb 200657.7InstalledBishop of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino, Italy
26 Jun 202173.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Foligno, Italy
28 Aug 202173.2InstalledBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Sorrentino
Archbishop Domenico Sorrentino (born ) Bishop of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoscoreale, Diocese of Nola
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Assisi-Nocera Umbra-Gualdo Tadino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,937
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2021
  • i: AM, 2 Jul 2021
  • i: CB, 14 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jul 2021

Quantcast