Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Ervin Schmitz Simon, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Bluefields, Nicaragua

Apostolic Administrator of Siuna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1943 Born
3 Sep 197026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Jun 198440.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bluefields, Nicaragua
22 Jun 198440.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Elepla
17 Sep 198440.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elepla
28 Jul 199450.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua
30 Nov 201773.9AppointedBishop of Bluefields, Nicaragua
20 Jan 201874.1InstalledBishop of Bluefields, Nicaragua
9 Jan 202076.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Siuna, Nicaragua
12 Nov 202076.9RetiredBishop of Bluefields, Nicaragua
26 Jun 202177.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Siuna, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Pablo Ervin Schmitz Simon
Bishop Pablo Ervin Schmitz Simon O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bluefields

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFond-du-Lac, WI, USA
Ordained BishopS. Isidro, Church, Rama

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bluefields.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • aadm: CB, 9 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,413
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2020
  • i: AM, 12 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Apr 2021

Quantcast