Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Isidoro del Carmen Mora Ortega

Bishop-Elect of Siuna, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1970 Born
20 Sep 200333.5Ordained PriestPriest of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
8 Apr 202151.0AppointedBishop of Siuna, Nicaragua
26 Jun 202151.3Ordained BishopBishop of Siuna, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Isidoro del Carmen Mora Ortega
Father Isidoro del Carmen Mora Ortega (born ) Bishop-Elect of Siuna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatagalpa, Diocese of Matagalpa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Siuna, Diocese of Siuna

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Siuna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2021
  • ob: CB, 23 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Apr 2021

Quantcast