Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Russo

Deceased

Bishop of Acireale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1885Born
21 Dec 190722.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 193247.6AppointedBishop of Acireale, Italy
23 Oct 193247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acireale, Italy
4 Dec 193247.9InstalledBishop of Acireale, Italy
8 Apr 196479.2DiedBishop of Acireale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Russo
Bishop Salvatore Russo (born , died ) Bishop of Acireale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 73
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 652, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast