Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Ruiz Molina, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Mbaďki, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1959 Born
25 May 198526.3First VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
11 Jul 198728.4Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
24 Apr 198829.2Solemn VowsPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
11 Jul 201758.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bangassou, Central African Republic
11 Jul 201758.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania
12 Nov 201758.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arae in Mauretania
10 Mar 202162.1AppointedBishop of Mbaďki, Central African Republic
25 Apr 202162.2InstalledBishop of Mbaďki, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Jesús Ruiz Molina
Bishop Jesús Ruiz Molina M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Mbaďki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Cueva de Roa, Archdiocese of Burgos, Spain
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l’Immaculée Conception, Cathedral, Bangui, Archdiocese of Bangui

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mbaďki.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Jul 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,603
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Mar 2021
  • i: AM, 27 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast