Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guerrino Perin, M.C.C.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Mba´ki, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1944 Born
19 Mar 197026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
10 Jun 199551.3AppointedBishop of Mba´ki, Central African Republic
29 Oct 199551.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mba´ki, Central African Republic
10 Mar 202177.1RetiredBishop of Mba´ki, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Guerrino Perin
Bishop Guerrino Perin M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mba´ki

EventPlace
Birth PlacePianiga
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Bangui, Archdiocese of Bangui

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mba´ki.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,626
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast