Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascual Benjamín Rivera Montoya, T.O.R.

Prelate of Huamachuco, Peru

Priest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1964 Born
26 Jul 198723.1EnteredMember of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
17 Sep 199127.3Solemn VowsMember of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
5 Jul 199228.1Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
26 Jul 201955.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Huamachuco, Peru
30 Mar 202156.8AppointedPrelate of Huamachuco, Peru
6 May 202156.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Huamachuco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Pascual Benjamín Rivera Montoya
Bishop Pascual Benjamín Rivera Montoya T.O.R. (born ) Prelate of Huamachuco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAyotla, Diocese of Toluca, México, México
Ordained BishopCathedral, Huamachuco, Territorial Prelature of Huamachuco

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Huamachuco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jul 2019
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 29 Apr 2021
  • c2+: CB, 6 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 May 2021

Quantcast