Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Pascal Rebello, S.V.D.

Bishop of Francistown, Botswana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1950 Born
1976²25.7Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
10 May 197727.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
5 Jul 202171.2AppointedBishop of Francistown, Botswana
4 Sep 202171.4Ordained BishopBishop of Francistown, Botswana

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Pascal Rebello
Bishop Anthony Pascal Rebello S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Francistown

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNairobi, Vicariate Apostolic of Zanzibar, Kenya
Ordained PriestIndia
Ordained BishopOur Lady of the Desert, Cathedral, Francistown, Diocese of Francistown

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Francistown.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2021
  • ob: CB, 10 Aug 2021
  • c2+: CB, 4 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Sep 2021

Quantcast