Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William Prieto Daza

Bishop-Elect of San Vicente del Caguán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1974 Born
21 Mar 201338.2Ordained PriestPriest of Villavicencio, Colombia
5 Jul 202449.5AppointedBishop of San Vicente del Caguán, Colombia
25 Sep 202449.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Vicente del Caguán, Colombia
2 Oct 202449.7InstalledBishop of San Vicente del Caguán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for William Prieto Daza
Father William Prieto Daza (born ) Bishop-Elect of San Vicente del Caguán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Ordained BishopCathedral, Villavicencio, Archdiocese of Villavicencio

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of San Vicente del Caguán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2024
  • ob: CB, 8 Jul 2024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 8 Jul 2024