Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio di Pompeiana, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China

Titular Bishop of Echinus


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Mar 1808AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China
22 Mar 1808AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
16 Mar 1823AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China
16 Mar 1823AppointedTitular Bishop of Echinus
22 Jun 1823Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Echinus
19 Sep 1828DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio di Pompeiana
Bishop Giovanni Antonio di Pompeiana O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePompeiana, Italy
Ordained BishopChansi, Vicariate Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi
Death PlaceHanchungfu

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 183
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 21
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast