Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Michael Pilla

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1932Born
23 May 195926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
30 Jun 197946.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
30 Jun 197946.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Scardona
1 Aug 197946.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scardona
29 Jul 198047.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 Nov 198048.0AppointedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
6 Jan 198148.1InstalledBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
4 Apr 200673.3ResignedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
21 Sep 202188.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Michael Pilla (VIAF: 51269264)
Bishop Anthony Michael Pilla (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Ordained BishopCleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Death PlaceCleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,041
  • d: CB, 21 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Sep 2021

Quantcast