Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Donato Ogliari, O.S.B.

Abbot of Montecassino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1956 Born
3 Sep 197821.7ProfessedMember of Consolata Missionaries
3 Jul 198225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
1992²35.0Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Oct 201457.8AppointedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
22 Nov 201457.9InstalledAbbot of Montecassino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Donato Ogliari (VIAF: 32240195)
Abbot Donato Ogliari O.S.B. (born ) Abbot of Montecassino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErba, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Montecassino.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Oct 2014
  • i: CB, 25 Nov 2014
  • bpd: AM, 8 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast