Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Mota de Farias

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alagoinhas, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1925Born
25 Aug 195731.7Ordained PriestPriest of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
14 Jul 198256.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
14 Jul 198256.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
11 Sep 198256.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
7 Nov 198660.9AppointedBishop of Alagoinhas, Bahia, Brazil
24 Apr 200276.4RetiredBishop of Alagoinhas, Bahia, Brazil
12 Apr 202195.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Alagoinhas, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jaime Mota de Farias
Bishop Jaime Mota de Farias (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alagoinhas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Bento do Una
Ordained BishopGaranhuns, Diocese of Garanhuns, Pernambuco
Death PlaceAlagoinhas, Diocese of Alagoinhas, Bahia

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,424
  • opd/d: CB, 13 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast