Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tiago Postma

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1932Born
23 May 195926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Haarlem, Netherlands
20 Jun 197441.8AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
14 Dec 197442.3Ordained BishopBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
15 Mar 199562.6ResignedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
8 May 200269.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tiago Postma
Bishop Tiago Postma (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Garanhuns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmsterdam, Netherlands
Ordained BishopCollege Santa Sofia, Garanhuns, Diocese of Garanhuns, Pernambuco

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,525

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast