Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Demetrio Moscato

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1888Born
13 Oct 191224.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 193244.3AppointedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
8 Sep 193244.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
22 Jan 194556.9AppointedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
22 Oct 196880.7DiedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

MicroData Summary for Demetrio Moscato (VIAF: 89100079)
Archbishop Demetrio Moscato (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGallina

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast