Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelo Angiolo Melani, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Neuquén, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1938Born
16 Aug 196223.9First VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Mar 197031.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Jul 199354.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Viedma, Argentina
18 Sep 199355.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Viedma, Argentina
28 Jun 199556.7SucceededBishop of Viedma, Argentina
9 Jan 200263.3AppointedBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
8 Nov 201173.1ResignedBishop of Neuquén, Argentina
14 Apr 202182.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Neuquén, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Angiolo Melani
Bishop Marcelo Angiolo Melani S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Neuquén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Ordained BishopGimnasio Municipal, Viedma, Diocese of Viedma
Death PlacePucallpa, Vicariate Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,240
  • d: CB, 14 Apr 2021
  • c1/firs: CB, 15 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Apr 2021

Quantcast