Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Segismundo Martínez Álvarez, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1943Born
16 Aug 196118.4Solemn VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Jul 197229.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
7 Dec 200461.7AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
30 Jan 200561.9Ordained BishopBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
19 Mar 200562.0InstalledBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
19 Dec 201875.8RetiredBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
21 Apr 202178.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Segismundo Martínez Álvarez
Bishop Segismundo Martínez Álvarez S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Corumbá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcebes del Páramo, Spain
Ordained BishopHotel Fazenda Mato Grosso, Cuiabá, Archdiocese of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso
Death Placeda Cassems, Hospital, Corumbá, Diocese of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,816
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2018
  • d: CB, 21 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Apr 2021

Quantcast